Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4425 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/09/2023

                    88R14135 CJD-D
 By: Talarico H.B. No. 4425


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a temporary exemption from sales and use taxes for
 household goods.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.360 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.360.  HOUSEHOLD GOODS FOR LIMITED PERIOD. (a)  In
 this section, "household goods" means clothing, furniture, linens,
 china, crockery, kitchenware, medical equipment and supplies,
 children's toys, baby supplies, tools, pet supplies, and cleaning
 supplies.
 (b)  The sale of a taxable item is exempted from the taxes
 imposed by this chapter if:
 (1)  the item is household goods;
 (2)  the sales price of the item is less than $200; and
 (3)  the sale takes place during the period beginning
 at 12:01 a.m. Friday, January 5, 2024, and ending at 11:59 p.m.
 Sunday, January 7, 2024.
 (c)  The exemption provided by Subsection (b) does not apply
 to electronics or accessories, including jewelry, handbags,
 luggage, umbrellas, wallets, watches, and similar items carried on
 or about the human body, without regard to whether worn on the body
 in a manner characteristic of clothing.
 (d)  This section expires January 31, 2024.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect tax liability accruing before the effective date of this
 Act.  That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
 the liability for those taxes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.