Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4429 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/10/2023

                    By: Landgraf H.B. No. 4429


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain school district tax abatements for power system
 reliability projects.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 312, Tax Code is amended by amending
 subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  Except as provided by Subchapter D, [O]on or after
 September 1, 2001, a school district may not enter into a tax
 abatement agreement under this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 312.0025, Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 312.0025.  DESIGNATION OF REINVESTMENT ZONE BY SCHOOL
 DISTRICT. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter
 to the contrary, the governing body of a school district, in the
 manner required for official action and for purposes of Subchapter
 D of this Chapter, or Subchapter B or C, Chapter 313, may designate
 an area entirely within the territory of the school district as a
 reinvestment zone if the governing body finds that, as a result of
 the designation and the granting of a limitation on appraised value
 under Subchapter B or C, Chapter 313, for property located in the
 reinvestment zone, the designation is reasonably likely to:
 (1)  contribute to the expansion of primary employment
 in the reinvestment zone; or
 (2)  attract major investment in the reinvestment zone
 that would:
 (A)  be a benefit to property in the reinvestment
 zone and to the school district; and
 (B)  contribute to the economic development of the
 region of this state in which the school district is located.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 312, Tax Code, is amended by adding a new
 Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. SCHOOL DISTRICT TAX ABATEMENT FOR POWER SYSTEM
 RELIABILITY PROJECTS.
 Section 312.501.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter, a "power
 system reliability project" means an improvement to real property:
 (1)  with an appraised value of real tangible personal
 property of at least $1 billion first placed in service in this
 state on or after January 1, 2024, without regard to whether the
 property is affixed to or incorporated into real property;
 (2)  used to construct and operate a natural gas
 electric generation facility that provides dispatchable electric
 power to the ERCOT power region, and requires a Prevention of
 Significant Deterioration review by the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality for the authorization of an air permit and
 may include a plant that captures, uses, reuses, or stores carbon
 dioxide emissions for enhanced oil recovery, sequestration, or
 other commercial uses; and
 (3)  that is located in a reinvestment zone created by
 the school district.
 Section 312.502  ENTITLEMENT TO ABATEMENT (a) The
 governing body of a school district shall execute a tax abatement
 agreement with the owner of a power system reliability project to
 exempt the project from school district maintenance and operation
 ad valorem taxation the value of any improvements greater than $30
 million in appraised value.
 (b)  The abatement period begins on the first date of the tax
 year the project begins to achieve commercial operation.
 (c)  The duration of an abatement under this subchapter is 10
 years.
 Section 312.503.  REPORTING. The chief appraiser of
 each appraisal district with a power system reliability project
 shall deliver to the comptroller before July 1 of the year
 following the year in which the agreement was executed a copy of
 each tax abatement agreement.
 SECTION 4.  Section 403.302, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  For the purposes of this section, "taxable value" means
 the market value of all taxable property less:
 (1)  the total dollar amount of any residence homestead
 exemptions lawfully granted under Section 11.13(b) or (c), Tax
 Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school
 district;
 (2)  one-half of the total dollar amount of any
 residence homestead exemptions granted under Section 11.13(n), Tax
 Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school
 district;
 (3)  the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
 before May 31, 1993, or after June 1, 2023, within a reinvestment
 zone under agreements authorized by Chapter 312, Tax Code;
 (4)  subject to Subsection (e), the total dollar amount
 of any captured appraised value of property that:
 (A)  is within a reinvestment zone created on or
 before May 31, 1999, or is proposed to be included within the
 boundaries of a reinvestment zone as the boundaries of the zone and
 the proposed portion of tax increment paid into the tax increment
 fund by a school district are described in a written notification
 provided by the municipality or the board of directors of the zone
 to the governing bodies of the other taxing units in the manner
 provided by former Section 311.003(e), Tax Code, before May 31,
 1999, and within the boundaries of the zone as those boundaries
 existed on September 1, 1999, including subsequent improvements to
 the property regardless of when made;
 (B)  generates taxes paid into a tax increment
 fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code, under a reinvestment zone
 financing plan approved under Section 311.011(d), Tax Code, on or
 before September 1, 1999; and
 (C)  is eligible for tax increment financing under
 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
 (5)  the total dollar amount of any captured appraised
 value of property that:
 (A)  is within a reinvestment zone:
 (i)  created on or before December 31, 2008,
 by a municipality with a population of less than 18,000; and
 (ii)  the project plan for which includes
 the alteration, remodeling, repair, or reconstruction of a
 structure that is included on the National Register of Historic
 Places and requires that a portion of the tax increment of the zone
 be used for the improvement or construction of related facilities
 or for affordable housing;
 (B)  generates school district taxes that are paid
 into a tax increment fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code; and
 (C)  is eligible for tax increment financing under
 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
 (6)  the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
 under Section 11.251 or 11.253, Tax Code;
 (7)  the difference between the comptroller's estimate
 of the market value and the productivity value of land that
 qualifies for appraisal on the basis of its productive capacity,
 except that the productivity value estimated by the comptroller may
 not exceed the fair market value of the land;
 (8)  the portion of the appraised value of residence
 homesteads of individuals who receive a tax limitation under
 Section 11.26, Tax Code, on which school district taxes are not
 imposed in the year that is the subject of the study, calculated as
 if the residence homesteads were appraised at the full value
 required by law;
 (9)  a portion of the market value of property not
 otherwise fully taxable by the district at market value because of
 action required by statute or the constitution of this state, other
 than Section 11.311, Tax Code, that, if the tax rate adopted by the
 district is applied to it, produces an amount equal to the
 difference between the tax that the district would have imposed on
 the property if the property were fully taxable at market value and
 the tax that the district is actually authorized to impose on the
 property, if this subsection does not otherwise require that
 portion to be deducted;
 (10)  the market value of all tangible personal
 property, other than manufactured homes, owned by a family or
 individual and not held or used for the production of income;
 (11)  the appraised value of property the collection of
 delinquent taxes on which is deferred under Section 33.06, Tax
 Code;
 (12)  the portion of the appraised value of property
 the collection of delinquent taxes on which is deferred under
 Section 33.065, Tax Code;
 (13)  the amount by which the market value of a
 residence homestead to which Section 23.23, Tax Code, applies
 exceeds the appraised value of that property as calculated under
 that section; and
 (14)  the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
 under Section 11.35, Tax Code.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.