Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4446 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Landgraf, Tepper (Senate Sponsor - Springer) H.B. No. 4446
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain licensing and permitting requirements for game
 rooms; authorizing an occupational permit or license; authorizing a
 fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 234.134, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A county may require that an owner or operator of a game
 room obtain a license or permit or renew a license or permit on a
 periodic basis to own or operate a game room in the county. An
 application for a license or permit must be made in accordance with
 Section 234.1341 and with regulations adopted by the county.
 (a-1)  A county may require that a person employed by a game
 room, other than an owner or operator, obtain a license or permit or
 renew a license or permit on a periodic basis to be employed by a
 game room in the county. An application for a license or permit
 must be made in accordance with Section 234.1342 and with
 regulations adopted by the county.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 234, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 234.1341 and 234.1342 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 234.1341.  APPLICATION FOR OWNER OR OPERATOR LICENSE OR
 PERMIT. (a)  A county requiring a person to obtain a license or
 permit to own or operate a game room in the county shall require the
 person to submit a completed application as provided by this
 section for issuance or renewal of the license or permit and an
 application fee of $1,000 as required by the county.
 (b)  An application form developed by the county under this
 section must require the applicant to provide the following
 information:
 (1)  the name of the business, including a copy of the
 assumed name certificate;
 (2)  the legal name, social security number, date of
 birth, and other relevant information concerning each person who
 owns at least five percent of the business or serves in a management
 role for the business;
 (3)  the name and contact information of the owner of
 the property where the game room is located;
 (4)  information concerning any other game room
 previously or currently operated by the applicant;
 (5)  the applicant's fingerprints;
 (6)  a copy of the applicant's valid state-issued
 driver's license or personal identification card and social
 security card; and
 (7)  the applicant's consent for a criminal history
 record information check of the applicant.
 Sec. 234.1342.  APPLICATION FOR EMPLOYEE LICENSE OR PERMIT.
 (a)  A county requiring a person to obtain a license or permit to be
 employed by a game room in the county shall require the person to
 submit a completed application as provided by this section for
 issuance or renewal of the license or permit and an application fee
 of $50 as required by the county.
 (b)  An application form developed by the county under this
 section must require the applicant to provide the following
 information:
 (1)  the person's legal name, social security number,
 date of birth, and other relevant information;
 (2)  the person's criminal history;
 (3)  the applicant's fingerprints;
 (4)  a copy of the applicant's valid state-issued
 driver's license or personal identification card and social
 security card;
 (5)  a recent photograph of the applicant's face and a
 recent photograph of the applicant's full body; and
 (6)  the applicant's consent for a criminal history
 record information check of the applicant.
 (c)  A county may not issue or renew a license or permit for
 an applicant who has been previously convicted of a Class B
 misdemeanor or higher criminal offense.
 (d)  A county shall send a copy of fingerprints obtained
 under this section to the Department of Public Safety to allow the
 department to create a permanent record of the fingerprints in the
 criminal justice information system.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply to a
 license or permit issued or renewed on or after the effective date
 of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *