Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB456 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2023

                    By: Craddick, et al. (Senate Sponsor - King) H.B. No. 456
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 5, 2023;
 April 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 18, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 18, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 456 By:  Springer


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of certain
 interests in a mineral in place owned by certain charitable
 organizations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.18(a), Tax Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (a)  An organization that qualifies as a charitable
 organization as provided by this section is entitled to an
 exemption from taxation of:
 (1)  the buildings and tangible personal property that:
 (A)  are owned by the charitable organization; and
 (B)  except as permitted by Subsection (b), are
 used exclusively by qualified charitable organizations; [and]
 (2)  the real property owned by the charitable
 organization consisting of:
 (A)  an incomplete improvement that:
 (i)  is under active construction or other
 physical preparation; and
 (ii)  is designed and intended to be used
 exclusively by qualified charitable organizations; and
 (B)  the land on which the incomplete improvement
 is located that will be reasonably necessary for the use of the
 improvement by qualified charitable organizations; and
 (3)  if the charitable organization is described by
 Subsection (d)(1), (2), (3)(A)(ii), (5), (8), (13), (15), or (19),
 the real property owned by the charitable organization consisting
 of an interest in a mineral in place, including a royalty interest,
 provided that the interest:
 (A)  is not severed from the surface estate; or
 (B)  was donated to the charitable organization by
 the previous owner of the interest.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to ad valorem taxes imposed
 for a tax year beginning on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2024.
 * * * * *