Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4654 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/09/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    88R13997 CJC-D
 By: Hayes H.B. No. 4654


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing for a reduction in the total number of state
 agency rules.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 2001, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2001.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2001.008.  REQUIREMENT TO REDUCE NUMBER OF RULES. (a)
 Not later than January 1, 2024, each state agency shall determine
 the total number of rules adopted by the agency under this chapter
 or other law that are in effect on that date and post that number in
 a conspicuous location on the agency's Internet website, along with
 an explanation that the number represents the current total number
 of rules of that agency.
 (b)  Any person may challenge the number of rules determined
 by a state agency under Subsection (a) by providing written notice
 of the challenge to the agency not later than March 1, 2024.
 (c)  Not later than April 1, 2024, a state agency that
 receives written notice of a challenge under Subsection (b) shall:
 (1)  approve the challenge and adjust the posting
 required under Subsection (a) to reflect the correct number of
 rules; or
 (2)  disapprove the challenge and forward the written
 notice to the standing committee of each house of the legislature
 with primary jurisdiction over the agency.
 (d)  Not later than June 1, 2024, a standing committee to
 which a challenge is forwarded under Subsection (c) shall:
 (1)  approve the challenge and order the state agency
 to which the challenge relates to adjust the posting required under
 Subsection (a) to reflect the correct number of rules; or
 (2)  disapprove the challenge and affirm the number of
 rules posted by the agency under Subsection (a).
 (e)  Not later than August 1, 2024, each state agency shall
 identify a number of rules equal to 10 percent of the number of
 rules posted by the agency under Subsection (a) that the agency will
 repeal.
 (f)  Not later than October 1, 2024, each state agency shall
 repeal the rules identified by the agency under Subsection (e).
 (g)  This section expires December 31, 2024.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.