Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4660 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2023

                    By: Isaac (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 4660
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 4, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 18, 2023, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 BirdwellX
 ZaffiriniX
 AlvaradoX
 BlancoX
 HancockX
 HughesX
 KolkhorstX
 MilesX
 SparksX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in
 certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 351, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 351.10693 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.10693.  ALLOCATION OF REVENUE: CERTAIN
 MUNICIPALITIES.  (a)  This section applies only to a municipality:
 (1)  with a population of less than 3,000;
 (2)  through which the Blanco River flows; and
 (3)  that is located in a county that:
 (A)  is adjacent to the county in which the State
 Capitol is located; and
 (B)  has a population of at least 250,000.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, a
 municipality to which this section applies may use revenue from the
 municipal hotel occupancy tax for the promotion and preservation of
 dark skies through construction and maintenance of infrastructure
 and the purchase and installation of hardware that reduces light
 pollution and sky glow.
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, a
 municipality to which this section applies may use revenue from the
 municipal hotel occupancy tax for promotional and event expenses
 for an ecological tourism event, including an event for which the
 primary attraction is traveling to an area of natural or ecological
 interest for the purpose of observing and learning about wildlife
 and the area's natural environment, if:
 (1)  a majority of the event's participants are
 tourists; and
 (2)  the event substantially increases economic
 activity at hotels and motels within or in the vicinity of the
 municipality.
 (d)  A municipality that uses revenue from the municipal
 hotel occupancy tax for a purpose described by Subsection (b) or
 (c):
 (1)  shall determine the amount of area hotel revenue
 attributable to events and activities related to those purposes for
 five years after the date the municipality first uses hotel
 occupancy tax revenue for a purpose described by Subsection (b) or
 (c); and
 (2)  may not spend municipal hotel occupancy tax
 revenue for the purposes described by Subsections (b) and (c) in a
 total amount that exceeds the amount determined under Subdivision
 (1).
 (e)  A municipality may not spend more than 25 percent of the
 municipality's annual hotel occupancy tax revenue for the purposes
 described by Subsections (b) and (c).
 (f)  A municipality to which this section applies may not
 reduce the amount of revenue that the municipality uses for a
 purpose described by Section 351.101(a)(3) to an amount that is
 less than the average amount of revenue used by the municipality for
 that purpose during the 36-month period that precedes the
 municipality's use of revenue under Subsection (b) or (c).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *