Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4696 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/11/2023

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 88TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             April 10, 2023       TO: Honorable James B. Frank, Chair, House Committee on Human Services     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB4696 by Noble (Relating to transferring certain investigations of abuse, neglect, and exploitation to the Health and Human Services Commission and the on-site investigation and survey of certain providers by the Health and Human Services Commission.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4696, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($272,686) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2024($248,064)2025($24,622)2026$02027$02028$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1 Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGR Match For Medicaid758 Probable Savings/(Cost) fromFederal Funds5552024($244,352)($3,712)($19,807)2025($24,253)($369)($1,967)2026$0$0$02027$0$0$02028$0$0$0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would transfer investigations of abuse, neglect, or exploitation of a resident of certain facilities from the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC).The bill would require the transfer of funding and resources from DFPS to HHSC to perform the functions required and amended by the bill no later than December 1, 2023.The bill would take effect September 1, 2023

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 88TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 10, 2023

 

 

  TO: Honorable James B. Frank, Chair, House Committee on Human Services     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB4696 by Noble (Relating to transferring certain investigations of abuse, neglect, and exploitation to the Health and Human Services Commission and the on-site investigation and survey of certain providers by the Health and Human Services Commission.), As Introduced   

TO: Honorable James B. Frank, Chair, House Committee on Human Services
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB4696 by Noble (Relating to transferring certain investigations of abuse, neglect, and exploitation to the Health and Human Services Commission and the on-site investigation and survey of certain providers by the Health and Human Services Commission.), As Introduced

 Honorable James B. Frank, Chair, House Committee on Human Services

 Honorable James B. Frank, Chair, House Committee on Human Services

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 HB4696 by Noble (Relating to transferring certain investigations of abuse, neglect, and exploitation to the Health and Human Services Commission and the on-site investigation and survey of certain providers by the Health and Human Services Commission.), As Introduced 

 HB4696 by Noble (Relating to transferring certain investigations of abuse, neglect, and exploitation to the Health and Human Services Commission and the on-site investigation and survey of certain providers by the Health and Human Services Commission.), As Introduced 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4696, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($272,686) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4696, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($272,686) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2024 ($248,064)
2025 ($24,622)
2026 $0
2027 $0
2028 $0

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2024 ($244,352) ($3,712) ($19,807)
2025 ($24,253) ($369) ($1,967)
2026 $0 $0 $0
2027 $0 $0 $0
2028 $0 $0 $0

 Fiscal Analysis

The bill would transfer investigations of abuse, neglect, or exploitation of a resident of certain facilities from the Department of Family and Protective Services (DFPS) to the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC).The bill would require the transfer of funding and resources from DFPS to HHSC to perform the functions required and amended by the bill no later than December 1, 2023.The bill would take effect September 1, 2023

 Methodology

It is assumed the transfer of funding and resources from DFPS to HHSC would have no net cost to General Revenue and are not reflected in the table above. It is assumed the transfer from DFPS to HHSC would include an estimated $610,814 in All Funds in fiscal year 2024 and $579,644 in All Funds in fiscal year 2025, including employee benefits. Amounts stated are primarily associated with the transfer of personnel, including 6.0 Protective Services Intake Specialist V full-time-equivalents (FTEs) per fiscal year to respond to calls related to the reporting of abuse and neglect, and 0.2 Program Specialist V FTEs per fiscal year for indirect agency functions. Amounts transferred or received in All Funds may vary based on actual transfers made between the agencies pursuant to Section 14 of the bill, or according to federal matching rates available to the state agencies to discontinue or perform the functions required by the bill. According to DFPS, there would be one-time costs and personnel to account for the transfer of certain investigations required by the bill. These costs are primarily related to technology and are described in the section below.It is assumed that HHSC can perform all other functions of the bill with existing resources.

 Technology

Total technology costs are estimated to be $267,871in fiscal year 2024 and $26,589 in fiscal year 2025. According to DFPS, there would be additional one-time costs to update the Information Management Protecting Adults and Children in Texas (IMPACT) and Statewide Intake (SWI) applications to account for the transfer of certain investigations required by the bill, and to transfer documentation. Costs reported are primarily related to updates to IMPACT.

 Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

529 Health and Human Services Commission, 530 Family and Protective Services, Department of

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, NPe, ER, SB

JMc, NPe, ER, SB