Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4742 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/12/2023

                    By: Lopez of Cameron, et al. H.B. No. 4742
 (Senate Sponsor - LaMantia)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 12, 2023, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 12, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 PerryX
 HancockX
 BlancoX
 FloresX
 GutierrezX
 JohnsonX
 KolkhorstX
 SparksX
 SpringerX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study by the Texas Water Development Board of issues
 faced by communities with artificial drainage systems.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  In this Act, "artificial drainage system" means
 a system to remove floodwater in a community that lacks topographic
 relief, slope, and naturally defined floodways.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Water Development Board, before
 January 1, 2025, may:
 (1)  study issues faced by communities with artificial
 drainage systems; and
 (2)  prepare a written report that contains possible
 recommendations relating to addressing identified issues facing
 those communities.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *