By: Lopez of Cameron, et al. H.B. No. 4742 (Senate Sponsor - LaMantia) (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023; May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 12, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 12, 2023, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE VOTE YeaNayAbsentPNV PerryX HancockX BlancoX FloresX GutierrezX JohnsonX KolkhorstX SparksX SpringerX A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study by the Texas Water Development Board of issues faced by communities with artificial drainage systems. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. In this Act, "artificial drainage system" means a system to remove floodwater in a community that lacks topographic relief, slope, and naturally defined floodways. SECTION 2. The Texas Water Development Board, before January 1, 2025, may: (1) study issues faced by communities with artificial drainage systems; and (2) prepare a written report that contains possible recommendations relating to addressing identified issues facing those communities. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. * * * * *