Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4758 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2023

                    By: Thierry, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Springer) H.B. No. 4758
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 21, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a prohibition on certain e-cigarette products; creating
 a criminal offense.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  This Act may be cited as the Protecting Children
 from Electronic Cigarette Advertising Act.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 161, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 161.0876 to read as follows:
 Sec. 161.0876.  PROHIBITED E-CIGARETTE PRODUCTS. (a)  A
 person commits an offense if the person markets, advertises, sells,
 or causes to be sold an e-cigarette product, if the product's
 container:
 (1)  depicts a cartoon-like fictional character that
 mimics a character primarily aimed at entertaining minors;
 (2)  imitates or mimics trademarks or trade dress of
 products that are or have been primarily marketed to minors;
 (3)  includes a symbol that is primarily used to market
 products to minors;
 (4)  includes an image of a celebrity; or
 (5)  includes an image that resembles a food product,
 including candy or juice.
 (b)  An offense under this section is a Class B misdemeanor.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2024.
 * * * * *