Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4865 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/05/2023

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 88TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             May 5, 2023       TO: Honorable Morgan Meyer, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB4865 by Harris, Cody (relating to the taxation of cigars and pipe tobacco sold by certain remote retail sellers; requiring an occupational permit.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4865, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted : a positive impact of $383,000 through the biennium ending August 31, 2025.  General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2024$97,0002025$286,0002026$286,0002027$286,0002028$286,000All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain/(Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund12024$97,0002025$286,0002026$286,0002027$286,0002028$286,000 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would amend Chapter 155 of the Tax Code, regarding the cigars and tobacco products tax, to create a remote retail seller permit.The bill requires remote sellers to obtain a remote retail seller's permit to sell cigars or pipe tobacco remotely into Texas. The permit fee would be $180 and the permittee would be required to remit all pertinent sales and excise taxes on cigars and pipe tobacco they sell into Texas.The Comptroller would be required to adopt rules necessary to implement changes made by the bill by January 1, 2024.The bill would take effect September 1, 2023 except that the remote retail seller permit would not be required until April 1, 2024.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 88TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
May 5, 2023

 

 

  TO: Honorable Morgan Meyer, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB4865 by Harris, Cody (relating to the taxation of cigars and pipe tobacco sold by certain remote retail sellers; requiring an occupational permit.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted   

TO: Honorable Morgan Meyer, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB4865 by Harris, Cody (relating to the taxation of cigars and pipe tobacco sold by certain remote retail sellers; requiring an occupational permit.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted

 Honorable Morgan Meyer, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means

 Honorable Morgan Meyer, Chair, House Committee on Ways & Means

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 HB4865 by Harris, Cody (relating to the taxation of cigars and pipe tobacco sold by certain remote retail sellers; requiring an occupational permit.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted 

 HB4865 by Harris, Cody (relating to the taxation of cigars and pipe tobacco sold by certain remote retail sellers; requiring an occupational permit.), Committee Report 1st House, Substituted 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4865, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted : a positive impact of $383,000 through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB4865, Committee Report 1st House, Substituted : a positive impact of $383,000 through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. 

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2024 $97,000
2025 $286,000
2026 $286,000
2027 $286,000
2028 $286,000

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2024 $97,000
2025 $286,000
2026 $286,000
2027 $286,000
2028 $286,000

 Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend Chapter 155 of the Tax Code, regarding the cigars and tobacco products tax, to create a remote retail seller permit.The bill requires remote sellers to obtain a remote retail seller's permit to sell cigars or pipe tobacco remotely into Texas. The permit fee would be $180 and the permittee would be required to remit all pertinent sales and excise taxes on cigars and pipe tobacco they sell into Texas.The Comptroller would be required to adopt rules necessary to implement changes made by the bill by January 1, 2024.The bill would take effect September 1, 2023 except that the remote retail seller permit would not be required until April 1, 2024.

 Methodology

The Comptroller's analysis is based on information provided by industry sources on cigars sold into Texas and the number of potential permittees.

 Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, KK, SD, BRI

JMc, KK, SD, BRI