By: Holland (Senate Sponsor - Flores) H.B. No. 4879 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023; May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE VOTE YeaNayAbsentPNV WhitmireX FloresX BettencourtX HinojosaX HuffmanX KingX MilesX A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to incident-based reporting of information and statistics concerning offenses committed in this state and the establishment of the Texas crime information system by the Department of Public Safety. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 411.054, Government Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 411.054. INCIDENT-BASED CRIME STATISTICS REPORTING BY LOCAL LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCIES [GOAL]. (a) The department shall require [establish a goal that, not later than September 1, 2019,] all local law enforcement agencies to: (1) implement [will have implemented] an incident-based reporting system that meets the reporting requirements of the National Incident-Based Reporting System of the Uniform Crime Reporting Program of the Federal Bureau of Investigation; and (2) [will] use the system described by Subdivision (1) to submit to the department information and statistics concerning criminal offenses committed in the jurisdiction of the local law enforcement agency. (b) The department by rule shall prescribe the form and manner for submitting information and statistics under this section [Not later than January 1, 2017, the department shall submit a report to the legislature that identifies the number of local law enforcement agencies that have implemented the system described by Subsection (a)]. (c) Except as otherwise provided by this section and Section 411.0541, information and statistics submitted to the department under this section are confidential and not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552. (d) The department shall submit the information and statistics received by the department under this section to the Uniform Crime Reporting Program of the Federal Bureau of Investigation, as required by that program. SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 411, Government Code, is amended by adding Section 411.0541 to read as follows: Sec. 411.0541. TEXAS CRIME INFORMATION SYSTEM. (a) In this section: (1) "Criminal justice agency" means: (A) a state agency that is engaged in the administration of criminal justice under a statute or executive order and allocates a substantial part of the agency's annual budget to the administration of criminal justice; or (B) a municipal or county agency, or school district law enforcement agency, that is engaged in the administration of criminal justice under a statute or executive order. (2) "System" means the computer-based Texas crime information system established under Subsection (b). (b) The department shall establish and maintain a computer-based Texas crime information system that includes all of the information and statistics submitted to the department under Section 411.054. (c) The department shall restrict access to the system to authorized personnel of criminal justice agencies, as determined by the department. (d) The department shall use the information included in the system to periodically publish reports regarding the nature and extent of criminal activities in this state. The department shall submit each report published under this subsection to the governor and each member of the legislature and shall publish each report on the department's Internet website. SECTION 3. The Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas shall adopt rules as necessary to implement Section 411.0541, Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. * * * * *