Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4888 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hefner (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 4888
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
 May 11, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 19, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 4888 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to Medicaid coverage and reimbursement for non-opioid
 treatments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 32, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 32.03117 to read as follows:
 Sec. 32.03117.  REIMBURSEMENT FOR NON-OPIOID TREATMENTS.
 (a) In this section, "non-opioid treatment" means a drug or
 biological product that is indicated to produce analgesia without
 acting on the body's opioid receptors.
 (b)  The commission shall ensure that medical assistance
 reimbursement is provided to a provider who provides a non-opioid
 treatment to a recipient under the medical assistance program.
 (c)  The executive commissioner by rule shall ensure that, to
 the extent permitted by federal law, a hospital provider that
 provides outpatient department services to a medical assistance
 recipient is reimbursed separately under the medical assistance
 program for any non-opioid treatment provided as a part of those
 services.
 SECTION 2.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *