Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4932 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2023

                    By: Lopez of Cameron, et al. H.B. No. 4932
 (Senate Sponsor - Sparks)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 18, 2023, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 BirdwellX
 ZaffiriniX
 AlvaradoX
 BlancoX
 HancockX
 HughesX
 KolkhorstX
 MilesX
 SparksX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the amount of foreign emissions of air contaminants in
 nonattainment areas and the revision of the state implementation
 plan to account for those emissions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 382, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 382.0175 to read as follows:
 Sec. 382.0175.  AMOUNT OF FOREIGN EMISSIONS IN NONATTAINMENT
 AREAS; REVISION OF STATE IMPLEMENTATION PLAN. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Foreign emissions" means emissions of air
 contaminants emanating from outside the United States.
 (2)  "Federal air quality monitor" means a monitor that
 is used to report data to the United States Environmental
 Protection Agency to demonstrate compliance with the national
 ambient air quality standards.
 (b)  The commission shall estimate the contribution of
 foreign emissions at each federal air quality monitor located in
 each nonattainment area in this state with respect to each air
 contaminant for which the area is designated as being in
 nonattainment for any national ambient air quality standards for
 ozone or particulate matter. The commission may contract with a
 third party to conduct the estimate required by this subsection.
 (c)  Not later than September 1, 2027, the executive director
 shall, using the estimate conducted under Subsection (b), report to
 the commission a recommendation on whether to revise the state
 implementation plan to account for the contribution of foreign
 emissions in each nonattainment area in this state in any manner
 permissible under federal law. In preparing the report to the
 commission, the executive director shall consider any areas in this
 state designated as nonattainment for ozone or particulate matter
 as of September 1, 2026.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2029.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *