Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4996 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/10/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    88R8305 SCP-F
 By: Bell of Montgomery H.B. No. 4996


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a statewide cyber insurance program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Department" means the Department of Information
 Resources.
 (2)  "Office" means the State Office of Risk
 Management.
 (3)  "Risk framework" means key security domains
 identified by cyber insurance underwriters based on current
 security controls.
 (4)  "Security controls" include:
 (A)  use of multiple security levels;
 (B)  managing user access;
 (C)  user authentication;
 (D)  network and server vulnerability;
 (E)  malware defense;
 (F)  operational technology;
 (G)  remote work;
 (H)  third-party vendor management;
 (I)  e-mail filtering;
 (J)  response planning;
 (K)  data encryption and backup;
 (L)  use of wireless devices and connections;
 (M)  monitoring users or devices;
 (N)  continuity of service;
 (O)  incident response;
 (P)  appropriate insurance coverage; and
 (Q)  governance.
 SECTION 2.  STUDY. Not later than October 1, 2023, the
 department shall contract with a cyber risk model vendor to conduct
 a study on the development of a statewide risk framework in order to
 determine the need for and feasibility of implementing a statewide
 cyber insurance program. The department shall enter into a
 memorandum of understanding with the office to support this
 assessment.
 SECTION 3.  INSURANCE PROGRAM. Based on the results of the
 study required by Section 2 of this Act, the office may develop and
 maintain a statewide cyber insurance program meeting the
 specifications identified in the study.
 SECTION 4.  REPORT. Not later than April 1, 2024, the
 department, in conjunction with the office, shall prepare and
 submit to the governor and the legislature a report containing the
 results of the study and any recommendations for legislative or
 other action to address the need for and feasibility of requiring
 cyber insurance.
 SECTION 5.  EXPIRATION. This Act expires September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 6.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2023.