Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5042 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/10/2023

                    88R2118 CJC-F
 By: Howard H.B. No. 5042


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an adjustment of the limitation on the total amount of
 ad valorem taxes that may be imposed by a school district on the
 residence homestead of an individual who is elderly or disabled to
 reflect the most recent increase in the amount of the exemption of
 residence homesteads from ad valorem taxation by a school district
 and the protection of school districts against the resulting loss
 in local revenue.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.26, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (a-11) to read as follows:
 (a-11)  This subsection applies only to an individual who in
 the 2024 tax year qualifies for a limitation under this section and
 for whom the 2021 tax year or an earlier tax year was the first tax
 year the individual or the individual's spouse qualified for an
 exemption under Section 11.13(c). The amount of the limitation
 provided by this section on the residence homestead of an
 individual to which this subsection applies for the 2024 tax year is
 the amount of the limitation as computed under Subsection (a-10) of
 this section less an amount equal to the product of $15,000 and the
 tax rate of the school district for the 2022 tax year. This
 subsection expires January 1, 2025.
 SECTION 2.  Section 46.071, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-2) and amending Subsections (b-1) and (c-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a-2)  Beginning with the 2024-2025 school year, in addition
 to state aid a school district is entitled to under Subsection
 (a-1), a school district is entitled to additional state aid under
 this subchapter to the extent that state and local revenue used to
 service debt eligible under this chapter is less than the state and
 local revenue that would have been available to the district under
 this chapter as it existed on September 1, 2023, if any additional
 limitation on tax increases under Section 1-b(d), Article VIII,
 Texas Constitution, as proposed by the 88th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2023, had not occurred.
 (b-1)  Subject to Subsections (c-1), (d), and (e),
 additional state aid under this section beginning with the
 2022-2023 school year is equal to the amount by which the loss of
 local interest and sinking revenue for debt service attributable to
 any increase in the residence homestead exemption under Section
 1-b(c), Article VIII, Texas Constitution, as proposed by the 87th
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, 2021, and any additional
 limitation on tax increases under Section 1-b(d), Article VIII,
 Texas Constitution, as proposed by the 88th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2023, is not offset by a gain in state aid under this
 chapter.
 (c-1)  For the purpose of determining state aid under
 Subsection [Subsections] (a-1) or (a-2) [and (b-1)], local interest
 and sinking revenue for debt service is limited to revenue required
 to service debt eligible under this chapter as of September 1, 2021,
 or as of September 1, 2023, respectively, including refunding of
 the applicable [that] debt, subject to Section 46.061.  The
 limitation imposed by Section 46.034(a) does not apply for the
 purpose of determining state aid under Subsection (a-1) or (a-2)
 [this section].
 SECTION 3.  Section 48.2542, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 48.2542.  ADDITIONAL STATE AID FOR ADJUSTMENT OF
 LIMITATION ON TAX INCREASES ON HOMESTEAD OF ELDERLY OR DISABLED.
 Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, if a school
 district is not fully compensated through state aid or the
 calculation of excess local revenue under this chapter based on the
 determination of the district's taxable value of property under
 Subchapter M, Chapter 403, Government Code, the district is
 entitled to additional state aid in the amount necessary to fully
 compensate the district for the amount of ad valorem tax revenue
 lost due to a reduction of the amount of the limitation on tax
 increases provided by Sections 11.26(a-4), (a-5), (a-6), (a-7),
 (a-8), (a-9), [and] (a-10), and (a-11), Tax Code, as applicable.
 SECTION 4.  Effective January 1, 2025, Section 48.2542,
 Education Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 48.2542.  ADDITIONAL STATE AID FOR ADJUSTMENT OF
 LIMITATION ON TAX INCREASES ON HOMESTEAD OF ELDERLY OR DISABLED.
 Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter, if a school
 district is not fully compensated through state aid or the
 calculation of excess local revenue under this chapter based on the
 determination of the district's taxable value of property under
 Subchapter M, Chapter 403, Government Code, the district is
 entitled to additional state aid in the amount necessary to fully
 compensate the district for the amount of ad valorem tax revenue
 lost due to a reduction of the amount of the limitation on tax
 increases provided by Sections 11.26(a-4), (a-5), (a-6), (a-7),
 (a-8), (a-9), and (a-10), Tax Code, as applicable.
 SECTION 5.  Section 48.2543, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-1) and amending Subsection (b) to read as
 follows:
 (a-1)  Beginning with the 2024-2025 school year, in addition
 to state aid a school district is entitled to under Subsection (a),
 a school district is entitled to additional state aid to the extent
 that state and local revenue under this chapter and Chapter 49 is
 less than the state and local revenue that would have been available
 to the district under this chapter and Chapter 49 as those chapters
 existed on September 1, 2023, if any additional limitation on tax
 increases under Section 1-b(d), Article VIII, Texas Constitution,
 as proposed by the 88th Legislature, Regular Session, 2023, had not
 occurred.
 (b)  The lesser of the school district's currently adopted
 maintenance and operations tax rate or the adopted maintenance and
 operations tax rate for:
 (1)  the 2021 tax year is used for the purpose of
 determining additional state aid under Subsection (a); and
 (2)  the 2023 tax year is used for the purpose of
 determining additional state aid under Subsection (a-1).
 SECTION 6.  Section 48.2556(a), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The agency shall post the following information on the
 agency's Internet website for purposes of allowing the chief
 appraiser of each appraisal district and the assessor for each
 school district to make the calculations required by Sections
 11.26(a-5), (a-6), (a-7), (a-8), (a-9), [and] (a-10), and (a-11),
 Tax Code:
 (1)  each school district's maximum compressed rate, as
 determined under Section 48.2551, for each tax year beginning with
 the 2019 tax year; and
 (2)  each school district's tier one maintenance and
 operations tax rate, as provided by Section 45.0032(a), for the
 2018 tax year.
 SECTION 7.  Effective January 1, 2025, Section 48.2556(a),
 Education Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The agency shall post the following information on the
 agency's Internet website for purposes of allowing the chief
 appraiser of each appraisal district and the assessor for each
 school district to make the calculations required by Sections
 11.26(a-5), (a-6), (a-7), (a-8), (a-9), and (a-10), Tax Code:
 (1)  each school district's maximum compressed rate, as
 determined under Section 48.2551, for each tax year beginning with
 the 2019 tax year; and
 (2)  each school district's tier one maintenance and
 operations tax rate, as provided by Section 45.0032(a), for the
 2018 tax year.
 SECTION 8.  Section 403.302, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (j-2) to read as follows:
 (j-2)  In the final certification of the study under
 Subsection (j), the comptroller shall separately identify the final
 taxable value for each school district as adjusted to account for
 the reduction of the amount of the limitation on tax increases
 provided by Section 11.26(a-11), Tax Code.  This subsection expires
 January 1, 2025.
 SECTION 9.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 11.26, Tax Code, applies only to an ad valorem tax year that begins
 on or after January 1, 2024.
 SECTION 10.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect January 1, 2024, but only if the constitutional
 amendment proposed by the 88th Legislature, Regular Session, 2023,
 providing for an adjustment of the limitation on the total amount of
 ad valorem taxes that may be imposed by a school district on the
 residence homestead of a person who is elderly or disabled to
 reflect the most recent increase in the amount of the exemption of
 residence homesteads from ad valorem taxation by a school district
 is approved by the voters.  If that amendment is not approved by the
 voters, this Act has no effect.