Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5142 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2023

                    By: Kacal (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 5142
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
 May 11, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 WestX
 AlvaradoX
 EckhardtX
 HancockX
 KingX
 MilesX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specially marked driver's licenses and
 personal identification certificates to veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.102, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b-2)  For purposes of Subsection (b)(2), the department
 must accept a veteran identification card issued by the United
 States Department of Veterans Affairs or an identification card
 issued by the United States Department of Defense as sufficient
 proof of the veteran's military service and honorable discharge.
 SECTION 2.  Section 521.1235, Transportation Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b-2)  For purposes of Subsection (b)(2), the department
 must accept a veteran identification card issued by the United
 States Department of Veterans Affairs or an identification card
 issued by the United States Department of Defense as sufficient
 proof of the veteran's military service and honorable discharge.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *