Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5178 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2023

                    By: Ashby (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 5178
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 18, 2023, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0, one present not voting;
 May 18, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing certain counties to impose a hotel
 occupancy tax and the applicability of that tax in certain
 counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 352.002, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (ee) to read as follows:
 (ee)  The commissioner's court of a county that has a
 population of 80,000 or more and that contains a portion of the
 Angelina National Forest may impose a tax as provided by Subsection
 (a).  A tax imposed under this subsection does not apply to a hotel
 located in a municipality that imposes a tax under Chapter 351
 applicable to the hotel.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *