Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5180 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

                    By: Wilson, Bucy H.B. No. 5180
 (Senate Sponsor - Hughes)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 17, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 5180 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the public inspection of election records.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.012, Election Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsections (f), (g), and (h) to
 read as follows:
 (e)  Except as provided by Subsections (f) and (g), an [An]
 election record shall be available not later than the 15th day after
 election day in an electronic format for a fee of not more than $50.
 (f)  Beginning on the first day after the date the final
 canvass of an election is completed, the general custodian of
 election records shall make available for public inspection
 election records that are:
 (1)  images of voted ballots, if a county maintains
 images of voted ballots; or
 (2)  cast vote records.
 (g)  Beginning on the 61st day after election day, the
 general custodian of election records shall make available for
 public inspection election records that are original voted ballots.
 (h)  The custodian shall adopt procedures to ensure the
 redaction of any personally identifiable information of the voter
 contained on a ballot before making the voted ballot available for
 public inspection.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *