Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5195 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

                    By: Thompson of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Johnson) H.B. No. 5195
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2023;
 May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 WhitmireX
 FloresX
 BettencourtX
 HinojosaX
 HuffmanX
 KingX
 MilesX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the services provided to certain children detained in a
 juvenile detention facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 54, Family Code, is amended by adding
 Section 54.021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.021.  SERVICES PROVIDED TO CHILD IN DETENTION
 FACILITY PENDING CRIMINAL PROSECUTION. (a) A child ordered to be
 detained in a juvenile detention facility under Section 54.02(h)
 shall, to the extent practicable, be provided education,
 programming, and other services consistent with the minimum
 standards adopted by the Texas Juvenile Justice Board for juvenile
 detention facilities under Section 221.002, Human Resources Code.
 (b)  The facility administrator, or the administrator's
 designee, of a juvenile detention facility shall:
 (1)  not later than the 21st day after the date on which
 a child is ordered to be detained in a juvenile detention facility
 under Section 54.02(h):
 (A)  complete an initial assessment of the child
 to evaluate the needs of the child; and
 (B)  develop a written plan to ensure the child
 has an opportunity to make progress on identified rehabilitation
 goals pending trial; and
 (2)  at least once every 90 days after the date on which
 the facility administrator or designee develops the written plan
 described by Subdivision (1), prepare a status report that
 documents:
 (A)  the education, programming, and other
 services provided to the child;
 (B)  behavioral compliance or incidents, if any;
 (C)  any measurable progress on identified
 rehabilitation goals during the preceding 90 days of detention; and
 (D)  any comments, observations, or
 recommendations related to the child's educational or
 rehabilitative needs.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *