Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB5309 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2023

                    By: Leo-Wilson, Bonnen H.B. No. 5309
 (Senate Sponsor - Middleton)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 11, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 WhitmireX
 FloresX
 BettencourtX
 HinojosaX
 HuffmanX
 KingX
 MilesX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the meeting requirements for the Galveston County
 Juvenile Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 152.0901(i), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (i)  Sections [152.0002,] 152.0003, 152.0004, 152.0005,
 152.0006, 152.0007, and 152.0008(a) do not apply to the juvenile
 board of Galveston County.
 SECTION 2.  Section 152.0901(d), Human Resources Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *