Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB568 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

                    By: Bowers, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 568
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023;
 April 18, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 11, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to education and training for peace officers on
 interacting with persons with Alzheimer's disease and other
 dementias.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1701.253(j), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (j)  As part of the minimum curriculum requirements, the
 commission shall require an officer to complete a 40-hour statewide
 education and training program on de-escalation and crisis
 intervention techniques to facilitate interaction with persons
 with mental impairments. The program must include instruction on
 interacting with persons with Alzheimer's disease and other
 dementias, including instruction on techniques for recognizing
 symptoms, communicating effectively, employing alternatives to
 physical restraints, and identifying signs of abuse, neglect, or
 exploitation. An officer shall complete the program not later than
 the second anniversary of the date the officer is licensed under
 this chapter or the date the officer applies for an intermediate
 proficiency certificate, whichever date is earlier. An officer may
 not satisfy the requirements of this subsection or Section
 1701.402(g) by taking an online course on de-escalation and crisis
 intervention techniques to facilitate interaction with persons
 with mental impairments.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than April 1, 2024, the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement shall revise the commission's
 education and training programs as necessary to implement the
 changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1701.253(j), Occupations Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to a person who submits an
 application for a peace officer license under Chapter 1701,
 Occupations Code, on or after April 1, 2024. A person who submits
 an application for a peace officer license under Chapter 1701,
 Occupations Code, before April 1, 2024, is governed by the law in
 effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *