By: Bowers, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 568 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023; April 18, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; May 11, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 11, 2023, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to education and training for peace officers on interacting with persons with Alzheimer's disease and other dementias. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 1701.253(j), Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: (j) As part of the minimum curriculum requirements, the commission shall require an officer to complete a 40-hour statewide education and training program on de-escalation and crisis intervention techniques to facilitate interaction with persons with mental impairments. The program must include instruction on interacting with persons with Alzheimer's disease and other dementias, including instruction on techniques for recognizing symptoms, communicating effectively, employing alternatives to physical restraints, and identifying signs of abuse, neglect, or exploitation. An officer shall complete the program not later than the second anniversary of the date the officer is licensed under this chapter or the date the officer applies for an intermediate proficiency certificate, whichever date is earlier. An officer may not satisfy the requirements of this subsection or Section 1701.402(g) by taking an online course on de-escalation and crisis intervention techniques to facilitate interaction with persons with mental impairments. SECTION 2. Not later than April 1, 2024, the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement shall revise the commission's education and training programs as necessary to implement the changes in law made by this Act. SECTION 3. Section 1701.253(j), Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, applies only to a person who submits an application for a peace officer license under Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, on or after April 1, 2024. A person who submits an application for a peace officer license under Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, before April 1, 2024, is governed by the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. * * * * *