Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB587 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2023

                    By: Patterson (Senate Sponsor - Blanco) H.B. No. 587
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2023;
 April 19, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Veteran Affairs; May 10, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 10, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HancockX
 ParkerX
 BlancoX
 EckhardtX
 GutierrezX
 HallX
 SparksX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the cremation of deceased veterans with a United States
 flag or Texas state flag and the incineration of those flags through
 the cremation process.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 716.001, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subdivision (4) and adding Subdivision (16) to
 read as follows:
 (4)  "Cremated remains" means the recoverable human
 remains after the completion of the cremation process. The term may
 include the residue of any nonhuman matter cremated with the
 deceased human body including casket material, bridgework,
 eyeglasses, the United States flag or state flag, or other
 material.
 (16)  "Veteran" means an individual who:
 (A)  has served in:
 (i)  the army, navy, air force, coast guard,
 or marine corps of the United States;
 (ii)  the state military forces as defined
 by Section 431.001, Government Code; or
 (iii)  an auxiliary service of one of those
 branches of the armed forces; and
 (B)  has been honorably discharged from the branch
 of the service in which the individual served.
 SECTION 2.  Section 716.002, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 716.002.  CREMATION RULES. (a) The commission may
 adopt rules consistent with this chapter and Chapter 651,
 Occupations Code, to govern the cremation of human remains.
 (b)  The rules must:
 (1)  allow a veteran to be cremated with the United
 States flag or state flag at the request of the veteran or the
 veteran's authorizing agent; and
 (2)  ensure that incineration of the United States flag
 or state flag with a veteran is in accordance with 4 U.S.C. Section
 8 and Chapter 3100, Government Code, as applicable.
 SECTION 3.  Section 716.052(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A cremation authorization form must:
 (1)  identify the deceased person and the time and date
 of death;
 (2)  include the name and address of the funeral
 director or other person that contracted to provide for the
 cremation;
 (3)  identify the authorizing agent and the
 relationship between the authorizing agent and the deceased person;
 (4)  include a statement by the authorizing agent that:
 (A)  the authorizing agent has the right to
 authorize the cremation of the deceased person and is not aware of
 any person with a superior or equal priority right; or
 (B)  if another person has an equal priority right
 to authorize cremation, the authorizing agent:
 (i)  has made all reasonable efforts but
 failed to contact that person and believes the person would not
 object to the cremation; and
 (ii)  agrees to indemnify and hold harmless
 the funeral establishment and the crematory establishment for any
 liability arising from performing the cremation without the
 person's authorization;
 (5)  authorize the crematory establishment to cremate
 the human remains;
 (6)  declare that to their knowledge the human remains
 do not contain a pacemaker or any other material or implant that may
 potentially be hazardous or cause damage to the cremation chamber
 or the person performing the cremation;
 (7)  include the name of the funeral establishment or
 other person authorized to receive the cremated remains from the
 crematory establishment;
 (8)  detail the manner of permanent disposition of the
 cremated remains, if known;
 (9)  list any items of value delivered to the crematory
 establishment along with the human remains and include instructions
 on the handling of the items;
 (10)  specify whether the authorizing agent has
 arranged for a viewing of the deceased person or service with the
 deceased person present before cremation and the date and time of
 the viewing or service; [and]
 (11)  include a space for the authorizing agent to
 request that a deceased person who is a veteran be cremated with the
 United States flag or state flag; and
 (12)  include the signature of the authorizing agent
 attesting to the accuracy of all representations contained on the
 cremation authorization form.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter D, Chapter 716, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 716.157 to read as follows:
 Sec. 716.157.  INCINERATION OF UNITED STATES FLAG OR STATE
 FLAG THROUGH CREMATION PROCESS. (a) A crematory establishment may
 incinerate through the cremation process and separately from human
 remains one or more United States flags or state flags at the
 request of any person. A crematory establishment may only
 incinerate a flag during the week preceding and the week after the
 following national holidays:
 (1)  Memorial Day;
 (2)  Flag Day; and
 (3)  Independence Day.
 (b)  The commission shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 this section. The rules must:
 (1)  establish guidelines on:
 (A)  crematory sanitation;
 (B)  the release of ashes from an incinerated
 United States flag or state flag to the person who requested
 incineration of the flag; and
 (C)  the disposal of ashes from an incinerated
 flag; and
 (2)  ensure that incineration of the flag is in
 accordance with 4 U.S.C. Section 8 and Chapter 3100, Government
 Code, as applicable.
 SECTION 5.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Funeral Service Commission shall adopt rules
 necessary to implement the changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *