Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB639 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/16/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lozano (Senate Sponsor - LaMantia) H.B. No. 639
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 6, 2023;
 April 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 16, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the number of temporary licenses to conduct bingo
 issued to certain authorized organizations in a calendar year.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2001.103(c) and (e), Occupations Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (c)  An authorized organization that does not hold a regular
 license to conduct bingo may [not] receive not more than 12 [six]
 temporary licenses in a calendar year.
 (e)  An [Notwithstanding Subsection (c), an] authorized
 organization that holds an annual license to conduct bingo may
 receive not more than 24 temporary licenses during the 12-month
 period following the issuance or renewal of the license.  The
 holder of a license that is effective for two years may receive not
 more than 24 temporary licenses for each 12-month period that ends
 on an anniversary of the date the license was issued or renewed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *