Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB671 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/16/2023

                    By: González of El Paso, et al. H.B. No. 671
 (Senate Sponsor - Eckhardt)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2023;
 May 8, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs; May 16, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 16, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HancockX
 ParkerX
 BlancoX
 EckhardtX
 GutierrezX
 HallX
 SparksX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a veterans suicide prevention campaign.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 434, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 434.0241 to read as follows:
 Sec. 434.0241.  VETERANS SUICIDE PREVENTION CAMPAIGN. (a)
 The Texas Veterans Commission shall conduct a suicide prevention
 campaign to provide veterans with information regarding suicide
 prevention.
 (b)  In conducting the suicide prevention campaign, the
 commission shall establish a dedicated Internet website to provide
 veterans with information regarding suicide prevention.
 (c)  The commission shall collaborate with, and may contract
 with, community-based, nonprofit, or private organizations to
 conduct the suicide prevention campaign under this section.
 (d)  The commission may solicit and accept gifts and grants
 for purposes of conducting the suicide prevention campaign under
 this section.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than March 1, 2024, the Texas Veterans
 Commission shall:
 (1)  establish the veterans suicide prevention
 campaign as required under Section 434.0241, Government Code, as
 added by this Act; and
 (2)  adopt any rules necessary to implement the
 campaign.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *