Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB699 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2023

                    By: Frank (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 699
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023;
 April 18, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 18, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 13, Nays 0; May 18, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 CreightonX
 CampbellX
 BettencourtX
 BirdwellX
 FloresX
 KingX
 LaMantiaX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 ParkerX
 PaxtonX
 SpringerX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to determining the student enrollment of a public school
 that allows non-enrolled students to participate in University
 Interscholastic League activities for purposes of assigning a
 University Interscholastic League classification.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.0832, Education Code, as added by
 Chapter 996 (H.B. 547), Acts of the 87th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2021, is amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as
 follows:
 (c-1)  When assigning league classification to a public
 school based on student enrollment, the league must use the same
 student enrollment calculation formula for a school that allows a
 non-enrolled student to participate in a league activity as
 provided by Subsection (c) as the formula used to determine the
 student enrollment of a school that does not allow a non-enrolled
 student to participate in the league activity.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2023-2024
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *