Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB786 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/28/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    88R19186 BDP-D
 By: Meza, et al. H.B. No. 786


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a report by the Windham School District on dyslexia and
 illiteracy among certain students enrolled in the district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) Not later than September 1, 2024, the
 Windham School District shall identify each student enrolled in the
 district who is younger than 22 years of age and has dyslexia or is
 illiterate.
 (b)  Not later than December 22, 2024, the Windham School
 District shall prepare and submit to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the
 members of the legislature a written report that includes:
 (1)  a summary of the district's findings under
 Subsection (a) of this section, including statistical information
 regarding the incidence of dyslexia and illiteracy among students
 enrolled in the district who are younger than 22 years of age; and
 (2)  legislative recommendations to address the
 incidence of dyslexia and illiteracy among students enrolled in the
 district who are younger than 22 years of age.
 SECTION 2.  This Act expires September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.