Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB842 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2023

                    By: Patterson (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 842
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023;
 April 18, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; April 26, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 26, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 WestX
 AlvaradoX
 EckhardtX
 HancockX
 KingX
 MilesX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting the suspension of a person's driver's
 license or extension of the period of a driver's license suspension
 for certain driving while license invalid convictions; authorizing
 a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.292(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Section 521.457(h), the [The]
 department shall suspend the person's license if the department
 determines that the person:
 (1)  has operated a motor vehicle on a highway while the
 person's license was suspended, canceled, disqualified, or
 revoked, or without a license after an application for a license was
 denied;
 (2)  is a habitually reckless or negligent operator of
 a motor vehicle;
 (3)  is a habitual violator of the traffic laws;
 (4)  has permitted the unlawful or fraudulent use of
 the person's license;
 (5)  has committed an offense in another state or
 Canadian province that, if committed in this state, would be
 grounds for suspension;
 (6)  has been convicted of two or more separate
 offenses of a violation of a restriction imposed on the use of the
 license;
 (7)  has been responsible as a driver for any accident
 resulting in serious personal injury or serious property damage;
 (8)  is under 18 years of age and has been convicted of
 two or more moving violations committed within a 12-month period;
 or
 (9)  has committed an offense under Section 545.421.
 SECTION 2.  Section 521.343(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Except as provided by Section 521.457(h), if [If] the
 license holder is convicted of operating a motor vehicle while the
 license to operate a motor vehicle is cancelled, disqualified,
 suspended, revoked, or denied, the period is extended for the same
 term as the original suspension or disqualification, in addition to
 any penalty assessed under this chapter or Chapter 522.
 SECTION 3.  Section 521.457, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (h), (i), and (j) to read as follows:
 (h)  Except as provided by Subsection (i), the department may
 not suspend a person's driver's license under Section
 521.292(a)(1), or extend the period a person's driver's license is
 suspended under Section 521.343(c), for a conviction of an offense
 under this section if:
 (1)  the offense was committed before September 1,
 2019;
 (2)  the person was convicted of the offense after
 August 31, 2023; and
 (3)  the person pays the department the fee required
 under Section 521.313(a) or any other fee required for the
 reinstatement of the person's driver's license in the manner
 prescribed by the department.
 (i)  Subsection (h) does not apply to:
 (1)  a commercial driver's license issued under Chapter
 522; or
 (2)  a person who was transporting hazardous materials
 or operating a commercial motor vehicle at the time of the offense
 under this section.
 (j)  The fee collected under Subsection (h)(3) shall be
 deposited to the credit of the Texas mobility fund.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *