Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB969 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2023

                    By: Cook, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Middleton) H.B. No. 969
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
 May 11, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HughesX
 PaxtonX
 BettencourtX
 BirdwellX
 LaMantiaX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to local regulation to enforce child custody orders;
 authorizing a civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 157, Family Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter K to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER K. LOCAL REGULATION AND ENFORCEMENT
 Sec. 157.551.  CIVIL PENALTY FOR INTERFERENCE WITH CHILD
 CUSTODY ORDER. A municipality or county in this state may adopt an
 ordinance or order that imposes a civil penalty of not more than
 $500 for engaging in conduct described by Section 25.03, Penal
 Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *