Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR94 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/13/2023

                    H.C.R. No. 94


 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The Lone Star State lost a business icon and
 renowned philanthropist with the passing of B. J. "Red" McCombs of
 San Antonio on February 19, 2023, at the age of 95; and
 WHEREAS, Billy Joe McCombs was born in the small West Texas
 town of Spur on October 19, 1927, and earned his nickname for his
 mop of red hair; a star athlete in high school, he earned a
 scholarship to play football at Southwestern University in
 Georgetown in 1945, but he put his studies on hold the following
 year to enlist in the United States Army; following his military
 service, he enrolled at Del Mar College in Corpus Christi, where he
 met the love of his life, the former Charline Hamblin; the couple
 exchanged wedding vows in November 1950; and
 WHEREAS, Although Mr. McCombs studied law at The University
 of Texas at Austin for a time, he changed course and began working
 as a car salesman in Corpus Christi, a job that was a natural fit for
 his talents and personality; by 1953, he had opened his first used
 car dealership, and a year later, he added sports to his business
 interests when he joined a friend in purchasing the Corpus Christi
 Clippers minor league baseball team, the first of what would be many
 sports franchise ventures; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. McCombs's well-earned reputation for turning
 around struggling businesses was demonstrated early on with a car
 dealership in San Antonio, and his auto sales empire ultimately
 expanded to more than 60 locations; he became a prominent figure in
 the Alamo City, and his involvement was key to the staging of
 HemisFair '68, which helped raise the community's stature
 nationally and internationally; in 1973, he purchased the Dallas
 Chaparrals basketball team and renamed it the San Antonio Spurs,
 providing the city with its signature professional team, and he was
 later instrumental in the opening of SeaWorld and the construction
 of the Alamodome; and
 WHEREAS, Demonstrating his business acumen in a broad range
 of endeavors, Mr. McCombs co-founded the mass media corporation
 Clear Channel Communications, which became iHeartMedia, and
 invested in oil and gas, real estate, cattle, motion picture
 distribution, and other industries; moreover, his enthusiasm for
 sports ownership, which he cited as his favorite business, extended
 beyond the Spurs and led to the acquisition of the Denver Nuggets
 and the Minnesota Vikings, and to the building of the Circuit of the
 Americas racetrack outside Austin; and
 WHEREAS, A philanthropist of equally legendary stature,
 Mr. McCombs supported a wide array of causes and institutions; in
 2000, his gift of $50 million to The University of Texas at Austin
 business school resulted in it being renamed the McCombs School of
 Business, and his donation of $3 million toward women's athletics
 at UT in 1997 led to the development of a new softball complex, the
 Red and Charline McCombs Field; Mr. and Mrs. McCombs also
 established the McCombs Foundation, which has contributed over $118
 million in gifts, both large and small, to charities and
 organizations based in San Antonio and other cities; in 2005, his
 donation of $30 million to MD Anderson Cancer Center resulted in the
 creation of another namesake facility, the Red and Charline McCombs
 Institute for the Early Detection and Treatment of Cancer; and
 WHEREAS, This larger-than-life Texan was passionate about
 collecting historical items, particularly Old West artifacts,
 which included paintings, saddles, walking sticks, and antique
 firearms; he eventually amassed around 7,000 of these items and put
 much of his extensive collection on loan, with more than 1,000
 pieces currently being housed at Southwestern University; and
 WHEREAS, Of all the decisions he made, Mr. McCombs considered
 marrying his wife, Charline, to be his best, and she was his partner
 in life as well as philanthropy until her passing in 2019; he took
 immense pride in his daughters, Lynda, Marsha, and Connie, and with
 the passing years, his family grew to include numerous
 grandchildren and great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Red McCombs left an indelible mark on the Lone Star
 State through his storied entrepreneurial success and his generous
 efforts to benefit communities, institutions, and worthwhile
 causes throughout Texas, and he will be fondly remembered and
 greatly missed by those who had the good fortune to know him; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 88th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of B. J. "Red" McCombs and extend
 deepest sympathy to the members of his family: to his daughters,
 Lynda McCombs, Marsha Shields and her husband, John, and Connie
 McNab and her husband, Sandy; to his grandchildren and
 great-grandchildren; and to all who mourn his passing; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Red McCombs.
 Craddick
 Dorazio
 Allison
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 94 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on April 5, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 94 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 12, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor