Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR125 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ashby, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.J.R. No. 125
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2023;
 May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 3, 2023, rereferred to Committee on Finance;
 May 16, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 16, Nays 1; May 16, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.J.R. No. 125 By:  Huffman


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment creating the broadband
 infrastructure fund to expand high-speed broadband access and
 assist in the financing of connectivity projects.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 49-d-16 to read as follows:
 Sec. 49-d-16.  (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Comptroller" means the comptroller of public
 accounts of the State of Texas or its successor.
 (2)  "Fund" means the broadband infrastructure fund.
 (b)  The broadband infrastructure fund is created as a
 special fund in the state treasury outside the general revenue
 fund.
 (c)  The fund consists of:
 (1)  money transferred or deposited to the credit of
 the fund by this constitution, general law, or the General
 Appropriations Act;
 (2)  revenue that the legislature by general law
 dedicates for deposit to the credit of the fund;
 (3)  investment earnings and interest earned on money
 in the fund; and
 (4)  gifts, grants, and donations to the fund.
 (d)  Money in the fund shall be administered by the
 comptroller. Money from the fund may be used only for the expansion
 of access to and adoption of broadband and telecommunications
 services, including:
 (1)  the development, construction, reconstruction,
 and expansion of broadband and telecommunications infrastructure
 or services;
 (2)  the operation of broadband and telecommunications
 infrastructure;
 (3)  the provision of broadband and telecommunications
 services; and
 (4)  the reasonable expenses of administering and
 managing the investments of the fund.
 (e)  The legislature by general law shall provide for the
 manner in which the assets of the fund may be used, subject to the
 limitations of this section. Money in the fund may be used in
 conjunction with other funds or financial resources, including
 money from the federal government, in accordance with procedures,
 standards, and limitations established by federal law and general
 law of this state.
 (f)  For purposes of Section 22, Article VIII, of this
 constitution:
 (1)  money in the fund is dedicated by this
 constitution; and
 (2)  an appropriation of state tax revenues for the
 purpose of depositing money to the credit of the fund is treated  as
 if it were an appropriation of revenues dedicated by this
 constitution.
 (g)  Unless extended by adoption of a concurrent resolution
 approved by a record vote of two-thirds of the members of each house
 of the legislature, this section expires on September 1, 2035. A
 resolution suspends the expiration of this section until September
 1 of the 10th year following the adoption of the resolution.
 (h)  Immediately before the expiration of this section, the
 comptroller shall transfer any unexpended and unobligated balance
 remaining in the fund to the general revenue fund.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the amendment to Article III of this constitution as proposed by
 the 88th Legislature, Regular Session, 2023, creating the broadband
 infrastructure fund to expand high-speed broadband access and
 assist in the financing of connectivity projects.
 (b)  The change made to Article III of this constitution by
 the amendment described in Subsection (a) of this section takes
 effect January 1, 2024.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2025.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 7, 2023.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment creating the broadband
 infrastructure fund to expand high-speed broadband access and
 assist in the financing of connectivity projects."
 * * * * *