Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR132 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/15/2023

                    By: Hefner, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.J.R. No. 132
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 15, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 13,
 Nays 4; May 15, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the imposition of
 an individual net worth or wealth tax.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 25 to read as follows:
 Sec. 25.  The legislature may not impose a tax based on the
 wealth or net worth of an individual or family, including a tax
 based on the difference between the assets and liabilities of an
 individual or family.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to held November 7, 2023.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment prohibiting the
 imposition of an individual wealth or net worth tax, including a tax
 on the difference between the assets and liabilities of an
 individual or family."
 * * * * *