Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR149 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/10/2023

                    H.R. No. 149


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, A caring and purposeful life drew to a close with the
 passing of Mary Susan Lamb Jenkins of Hankamer on January 30, 2023,
 at the age of 91; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Clarence Lamb Sr. and Marguerite
 Splane, Sue Jenkins was born on March 19, 1931, in Houston and grew
 up sharing in the companionship of three siblings, Clarence,
 Michael, and Martha; she graduated from Liberty High School and
 continued her education at Sam Houston State University, where she
 studied English; she went on to teach at Cedar Bayou Junior High
 School, Liberty Middle School, Immaculate Conception Catholic
 School, and Anahuac High School, where she also served as a cheer
 sponsor; and
 WHEREAS, On June 28, 1958, she married the love of her life,
 Jerry Jenkins, and the couple settled on the Jenkins rice farm in
 Hankamer, where they raised their three sons, John, Jerold, and
 Jay; active in the community, Mrs. Jenkins was a founding member of
 the Chambers County Republican Party, and she was also involved
 with the Chambers County Republican Women, the Wallisville Heritage
 Park, and the Daughters of the American Revolution; with the
 passing years, she had the pleasure of welcoming into the family
 four grandchildren and two great-grandchildren; and
 WHEREAS, Famous for her rice salad, Mrs. Jenkins was a
 skilled cook who never let her family and friends go hungry; in her
 leisure time, she enjoyed reading, gardening, and watching the
 Houston Astros, and she was also a valued member of the Quilt Guild;
 moreover, she drew great strength from her Catholic faith; and
 WHEREAS, While her loss is difficult to bear, Sue Jenkins
 leaves behind numerous friends and loved ones whose lives are far
 richer for having known her, and she will always hold a treasured
 place in their hearts; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Mary Susan Lamb
 Jenkins and extend sincere condolences to the members of her
 family: to her sons, John Jenkins and his wife, Jacqueline, Jerold
 Jenkins and his wife, Alicia, and Jay Jenkins and his wife,
 Jeanette; to her grandchildren, Justin Jenkins, Katherine Jenkins,
 and Alexis Craig and her husband, Tyler; to her
 great-grandchildren, Jack and Juliet Jenkins; and to her other
 relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Sue
 Jenkins.
 Leo-Wilson
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 149 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 8, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House