Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR2107 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2023

                    H.R. No. 2107


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The city of Houston lost a beloved civic leader and
 educator with the passing of Etta Crockett on May 7, 2023, at the
 age of 68; and
 WHEREAS, The daughter of Willie and Ince Crockett, Etta
 Crockett was born on July 6, 1954, and she grew up in Houston's
 Acres Homes neighborhood; following her graduation from George
 Washington Carver High School in 1972, she attended Prairie View
 A&M University and went on to enjoy a rewarding career as a teacher
 before retiring from the Aldine Independent School District; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply engaged in the community, Ms. Crockett was a
 lifelong supporter of the Democratic Party and served as Harris
 County Precinct 109 chair; moreover, she worked on numerous
 political campaigns through the years, helping to elect many of the
 city's most prominent office holders at the local, state, and
 national levels; she also contributed greatly to a number of
 initiatives designed to enhance the quality of life of her fellow
 citizens, and on March 29, 2023, she was recognized by the City of
 Houston for her many years of tireless support and loyal service;
 and
 WHEREAS, Although Etta Crockett's death has brought great
 sorrow to those who loved her, her life was an inspiring example of
 the good that one person can accomplish, and her legacy will be a
 continuing source of inspiration in the years ahead; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Etta Crockett and
 extend heartfelt sympathy to the members of her family: to her
 sisters, Delores Long and Ella Crockett; to her brothers, Carl
 Crockett and Maurice Crockett; to her niece, Sherita Taylor; to her
 loving companion, R. C. Jones; and to her other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Etta
 Crockett.
 Jones of Harris
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 2107 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on May 26, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House