Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR518 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/07/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    88R8179 CW-D
 By: Price H.R. No. 518


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The passing of former Texas state representative
 David Anthony Swinford on December 31, 2022, at the age of 81
 concluded a remarkable life of service to the Texas Panhandle and to
 the Lone Star State; and
 WHEREAS, David Swinford was born in Wichita Falls on June 28,
 1941, to Oley and Hazel Swinford, and he grew up with the
 companionship of three brothers, Sammy Alan, Earl, and Jerry;
 following his graduation from Frenship High School, he continued
 his education at South Plains College and then at Texas Tech
 University, where he earned a degree in agriculture education; on
 June 19, 1964, he exchanged wedding vows with the former Milas Joyce
 McCoy, and the couple settled in Dumas; they shared a rewarding
 marriage spanning more than five and a half decades, during which
 they became the proud parents of two children, Chris and Melissa;
 with the passage of time, Mr. Swinford welcomed five grandchildren
 and five great-grandchildren into his treasured family; he was
 preceded in death by a granddaughter, Christie Marie Bates; and
 WHEREAS, After first working for Lindsey Seed Company of
 Lubbock, Mr. Swinford launched his tenure with Moore County Grain
 in 1969; six years later, he and three business partners purchased
 the operation, and he subsequently took the helm of the Moore County
 Grain Handling Company as president and general manager; his wife
 and children played a vital role in the success of the business,
 which became one of the largest independent grain companies in
 Texas; he sold the company to Dumas Co-op, taking on work there as
 the marketing manager, and he ultimately left the co-op to
 establish Ag-Plus Consulting; and
 WHEREAS, Committed to serving his fellow citizens,
 Mr. Swinford successfully ran for a seat in the Texas House of
 Representatives in 1990, and he took office on January 8, 1991; he
 demonstrated great diligence in representing the counties of House
 Districts 87 and 88 over the course of two decades and 10
 legislative sessions, and he and other legislators from the
 Panhandle helped secure many key benefits for the region; among his
 most notable accomplishments in office, Representative Swinford
 led the charge to establish wind farms on the High Plains, thereby
 stimulating economic growth and job creation with the production of
 wind power; and
 WHEREAS, Earning a reputation for his strong leadership and
 keen intellect, Mr. Swinford was actively involved with caucuses,
 and he chaired a number of house committees, including State
 Affairs, Government Reform, and Agriculture and Livestock, as well
 as Public School Finance, Select Subcommittee on Governance;
 moreover, he received a gubernatorial appointment to the Southern
 States Energy Board, and he was appointed to the Texas Energy
 Council and the Texas Ag Policy Board; his legislative efforts in
 behalf of his constituents were recognized by many, and he garnered
 numerous well-deserved accolades for his work; he retired as a
 state representative on August 31, 2010; and
 WHEREAS, Through the years, Mr. Swinford actively supported
 the community at large, including as director of the Dumas/Moore
 County Chamber of Commerce and as president of the school board; he
 was a certified vocational education teacher and an agricultural
 consultant, and he lent his time and talents to local FFA clubs and
 to such organizations as the Dumas Little League, the Dumas Noon
 Lions Club, and the United Way; furthermore, he was honored by the
 Dumas Economic Development Corporation for his outstanding service
 to the board of directors; he also belonged to the National Grain
 and Feed Association, the Panhandle Grain and Feed Association, the
 Texas Grain and Feed Association, and the Texas Conservative
 Coalition; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Swinford was a devoted Christian, and he found
 great joy in serving his congregation at Sunray Church of Christ;
 additionally, he helped share the gospel worldwide through his
 partnership with the Sunset International Bible Institute in
 Lubbock; a member of the Sunset Council, he assisted with capital
 campaigns and with SIBI degree programs, and he helped facilitate a
 grant program from his church that supplied solar-powered audio
 players containing Bible teachings to a number of countries; and
 WHEREAS, A loving husband, father, and grandfather,
 Mr. Swinford cherished his family; he and his wife spent countless
 hours helping their children with their 4-H and FFA livestock
 projects, and he cheered on his grandsons at their academic,
 sporting, agriculture, and music events; and
 WHEREAS, David Swinford earned the respect and admiration of
 all who knew him, not only for his exemplary service as a Texas
 state representative but also for his exceptional kindness and
 generosity, and he leaves behind a legacy that will resonate for
 years to come; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the life of the Honorable David
 Anthony Swinford and extend deepest condolences to the members of
 his family: to his wife, Joyce Swinford; to his son, David
 Christopher Swinford, and his wife, Brenda; to his daughter,
 Melissa Rae Swinford Bates, and her husband, Rob; to his
 grandchildren, Phillip Bates and his wife, Alayna, William Bates
 and his wife, Isabel, Alan Swinford and his wife, Haylee, and Daniel
 Swinford; to his great-grandchildren, Adelyn, Ellie, Gavin,
 Kieran, and Josiah; to his brother-in-law, David McCoy; to his
 sisters-in-law, Sylvia Swinford and Jimmie Swinford; and to his
 other relatives and friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of David
 Anthony Swinford.