Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HR525 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.R. No. 525


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends were deeply saddened by the
 passing of Ollie Garza of Fort Worth on December 1, 2022, at the age
 of 58; and
 WHEREAS, The son of Ollie and Marie Garza, "Babe" Garza was
 born in Fort Worth on May 9, 1964, and he grew up with the
 companionship of three brothers, Johnny, Rudy, and Anthony; a
 natural born athlete, he played numerous sports throughout his
 youth until October 19, 1978, when a tragic accident while playing
 football for Diamond Hill-Jarvis High School left him paralyzed at
 the age of 14; never deterred by his need for a wheelchair, he
 graduated from high school in 1982 and went on to earn a bachelor's
 degree from The University of Texas at Arlington in 1996; and
 WHEREAS, Alongside a successful career in business,
 Mr. Garza was an active member of his community; he gave generously
 of his time to numerous organizations, including the Gridiron
 Heroes Spinal Cord Injury Foundation, Hispanic Organization
 Helping Others, and Toastmasters International, and he was also a
 member of the Dallas Wheelchair Sidekicks quad-rugby team that won
 the national championship in 1989; in addition, he authored the
 book Why Not Me? 8 Keys to Turning Tragedy into Triumph as a
 testament to his journey of recovery, independence, and success;
 and
 WHEREAS, Babe Garza earned the admiration of all who knew him
 through his strength of character and perseverance in the face of
 life's challenges, and he will forever remain a source of
 inspiration to those he leaves behind; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 88th Texas
 Legislature hereby pay tribute to the memory of Ollie Garza and
 extend sincere condolences to the members of his family: to his
 parents, Ollie and Marie Garza; to his daughter, Alexandria
 Vasquez; to his stepdaughter, Victoria Rios; to his brothers,
 Johnny Garza and his wife, Stephanie, and Rudy Garza and his wife,
 Leann; to his nieces, Amanda Perez, Samantha Xayavong and her
 husband, Kevin, and Jasmine Garza; to his nephews, Andrew Garza,
 Joshua Garza, Rudy Garza II, and Jorge "BJ" Perez; to his
 grandniece, Evelyn "Evie" Xayavong; and to his other relatives and
 friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Babe Garza.
 Romero, Jr.
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 525 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 16, 2023.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House