Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1133 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 03/29/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Blanco, et al. S.B. No. 1133
 (In the Senate - Filed February 23, 2023; March 9, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Border Security;
 March 29, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 29, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE VOTE              YeaNayAbsent PNVBirdwell       X              Flores         X              Blanco         X              Hinojosa       X              King           X              COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1133 By:  Flores


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a grant program to compensate landowners for property
 damage caused by certain criminal activities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 1, Code of Criminal Procedure, is amended
 by adding Chapter 56C to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 56C. GRANT PROGRAM FOR LANDOWNER COMPENSATION FOR PROPERTY
 DAMAGE CAUSED BY CERTAIN CRIMINAL ACTIVITIES
 Art. 56C.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Agricultural land" includes any land the use of
 which qualifies the land for appraisal based on agricultural use as
 defined under Subchapter D, Chapter 23, Tax Code.
 (2)  "Border crime" means conduct constituting an
 offense listed in Article 56C.002(a)(1), (2), or (3) and involving
 transnational criminal activity.
 (3)  "Trespasser" has the meaning assigned by Section
 75.007, Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 Art. 56C.002.  GRANT PROGRAM. (a) From money appropriated
 for the purpose, the attorney general shall establish and
 administer a grant program to compensate landowners who suffer
 property damage on agricultural land caused by a trespasser as a
 result of an offense under Chapter 28, Penal Code, that was
 committed in the course of or in furtherance of an offense under:
 (1)  Subchapter D, Chapter 481, Health and Safety Code;
 (2)  Section 20.05 or 38.04, Penal Code; or
 (3)  Chapter 20A, Penal Code.
 (b)  The attorney general shall establish:
 (1)  eligibility criteria for grant applicants;
 (2)  grant application procedures;
 (3)  criteria for evaluating grant applications and
 awarding grants;
 (4)  guidelines related to grant amounts, provided that
 the maximum amount awarded per grant may not exceed $100,000; and
 (5)  procedures for monitoring the use of a grant
 awarded under this article and ensuring compliance with any
 conditions of the grant.
 (c)  The eligibility criteria established under Subsection
 (b)(1) must include a requirement that the applicant reported the
 property damage to an appropriate law enforcement agency promptly
 after discovering the damage.
 (d)  In awarding a grant under this article, the attorney
 general:
 (1)  shall give priority to:
 (A)  applicants who suffered property damage as a
 result of an offense that was committed in the course of or in
 furtherance of a border crime; and
 (B)  applicants who suffered damage to
 structures, including fences, on the agricultural land; and
 (2)  may not consider the outcome of any criminal
 prosecution arising out of the offense under Chapter 28, Penal
 Code, as a result of which the applicant suffered property damage or
 the applicable offense listed in Subsection (a)(1), (2), or (3).
 Art. 56C.003.  ANNUAL REPORT. Not later than the 100th day
 after the end of each state fiscal year, the attorney general shall
 submit to the governor and the legislature a report on the attorney
 general's activities under this chapter during the preceding fiscal
 year that includes the following information, disaggregated by each
 offense listed in Articles 56C.002(a)(1), (2), and (3):
 (1)  the number of grant applications made;
 (2)  the number of grants awarded; and
 (3)  the amount of grant money distributed.
 Art. 56C.004.  PAYER OF LAST RESORT. The grant program
 established under Article 56C.002 is a payer of last resort for
 property damage described by that article.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *