Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB114 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/14/2022

                    88R1724 DIO-F
 By: Menéndez S.B. No. 114


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the provision of electricity service in the ERCOT power
 region.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.101(b), Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A customer is entitled:
 (1)  to be informed about rights and opportunities in
 the transition to a competitive electric industry;
 (2)  to choose the customer's retail electric provider
 consistent with this chapter, to have that choice honored, and to
 assume that the customer's chosen provider will not be changed
 without the customer's informed consent;
 (3)  to have access to providers of energy efficiency
 services, to on-site distributed generation, and to providers of
 energy generated by renewable energy resources;
 (4)  to be served by a provider of last resort that
 offers a commission-approved standard service package;
 (5)  to receive sufficient information to make an
 informed choice of service provider;
 (6)  to be protected from unfair, misleading, or
 deceptive practices, including protection from being billed for
 services that were not authorized or provided; [and]
 (7)  to have an impartial and prompt resolution of
 disputes with its chosen retail electric provider and transmission
 and distribution utility;
 (8)  to participation in demand response programs
 through retail electric providers and demand response providers;
 and
 (9)  to receive notice from the retail electric
 provider that serves the customer:
 (A)  when the independent organization certified
 under Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power region issues an emergency
 energy alert about low operating reserves to providers of
 generation in the power region; or
 (B)  of planned outages and the length of time the
 outages are expected to last.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 39, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.919 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.919.  RESIDENTIAL DEMAND RESPONSE PROGRAM. (a)  The
 commission by rule shall require each retail electric provider in
 the ERCOT power region to create a residential demand response
 program to reduce the average total residential load by at least:
 (1)  one percent of peak summer and winter demand by
 December 31, 2024;
 (2)  two percent of peak summer and winter demand by
 December 31, 2025;
 (3)  three percent of peak summer and winter demand by
 December 31, 2026; and
 (4)  five percent of peak summer and winter demand by
 December 31, 2027.
 (b)  The rules must:
 (1)  ensure that demand response participation is
 reasonably available to residential customers;
 (2)  promote the use of smart metering technology;
 (3)  ensure that demand response programs are capable
 of responding to an emergency energy alert about low operating
 reserves issued by the independent organization certified under
 Section 39.151 for the ERCOT power region;
 (4)  provide opportunities for demand response
 providers to contract with retail electric providers to provide
 demand response services; and
 (5)  ensure the program does not impact the critical
 needs of vulnerable populations.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.