Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1186 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/15/2023

                    S.B. No. 1186


 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation by the Railroad Commission of Texas of
 brine mining.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 27.036, Water Code, as added by Chapter
 921 (H.B. 1867), Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session,
 1985, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 27.036.  JURISDICTION OVER BRINE MINING.  (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Brine mining" means the production of brine,
 including naturally occurring brine and brine extracted by the
 solution of a subsurface salt formation, for the purpose of
 extracting from a subsurface formation elements, salts, or other
 useful substances, not including:
 (A)  oil, gas, or any product of oil or gas as
 defined by Section 85.001, Natural Resources Code; or
 (B)  fluid oil and gas waste, as defined by
 Section 122.001, Natural Resources Code.
 (2)  "Class V brine injection well" means a well that
 injects spent, naturally occurring brine produced by a brine mining
 operation into the same formation from which it was withdrawn after
 extraction of elements, salts, or other useful substances,
 including halogens or halogen salts.
 (b)  The railroad commission has jurisdiction over brine
 mining and may issue permits for brine production wells and
 injection wells used for brine mining.
 (c) [(b)]  A person may not begin to drill an injection well
 to be used for brine mining unless that person has a valid permit
 for the well issued by the railroad commission under this chapter.
 (d) [(c)]  The railroad commission shall adopt rules that
 are necessary to administer and regulate brine mining.
 (e) [(d)]  For purposes of regulation by the railroad
 commission, an injection well for brine mining of brine extracted
 by the solution of a subsurface salt formation is designated as a
 Class III well under the underground injection control program
 administered by the railroad commission.
 (f)  For purposes of regulation by the railroad commission, a
 Class V brine injection well is designated as a Class V well under
 the underground injection control program administered by the
 railroad commission.
 (g)  If rules or regulations adopted to govern Class V brine
 injection wells under the federal Safe Drinking Water Act (42
 U.S.C. Section 300f et seq.) or another federal statute allow this
 state to seek primary enforcement authority under the underground
 injection control program,  the railroad commission shall seek
 primacy to administer and enforce the program for Class V brine
 injection wells in this state.
 (h)  On delegation to the railroad commission of primary
 enforcement authority in this state over Class V brine injection
 wells, a person may not begin to drill a Class V brine injection
 well unless that person has a valid permit for the well issued by
 the railroad commission under this chapter.
 [(e)  This section takes effect September 1, 1985.
 [(f)  This section does not invalidate any permit for an
 injection well used for brine mining that was issued by the Texas
 Water Commission before the effective date of this section.  Within
 90 days after the effective date of this section, the Railroad
 Commission of Texas shall issue a substitute permit under the name
 and authority of the railroad commission to each person who on the
 effective date of this section holds a valid permit issued by the
 Texas Water Commission for an injection well used for brine mining.
 [(g)  Application for injection well permits covering brine
 mining submitted to the Texas Water Commission before the effective
 date of this section for which permits have not been issued by the
 commission shall be transmitted to the railroad commission.]
 SECTION 2.  Section 27.036, Water Code, as added by Chapter
 795 (S.B. 249), Acts of the 69th Legislature, Regular Session,
 1985, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1186 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1186 passed the House on
 May 12, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 4,
 two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor