Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1219 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 1219
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2023; March 9, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; April 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the confidentiality of fraud detection and deterrence
 and counterterrorism information under the public information law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 552, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 552.163 to read as follows:
 Sec. 552.163.  EXCEPTION: CONFIDENTIALITY OF INFORMATION
 REGARDING FRAUD DETECTION AND DETERRENCE MEASURES AND
 COUNTERTERRORISM MEASURES. Information in the custody of a
 governmental body that relates to fraud detection and deterrence
 measures or counterterrorism measures is confidential and excepted
 from the requirements of Section 552.021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *