Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1242 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2023

                    By: LaMantia S.B. No. 1242
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2023; March 9, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 24, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 24, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to training for employees and operators of certain
 child-care facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.0421, Human Resources Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (g-1) to read as follows:
 (g-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (g), a person who is the
 director of a day-care center may provide training under this
 section regardless of whether the commission imposed an
 administrative penalty under Section 42.078 against the day-care
 center if the person was not the director of the day-care center at
 the time the commission imposed the penalty.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *