Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1268 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/27/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Johnson, Perry S.B. No. 1268
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2023; March 9, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 27, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 1; April 27, 2023,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1268 By:  Johnson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of insurance deductibles for property
 insurance claims.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 27.02(c), Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  A person who sells goods or services commits an offense
 if the person:
 (1)  advertises or promises to provide a good or
 service to an insured under a property insurance policy in a
 transaction in which:
 (A)  the good or service will be paid for by the
 insured from the proceeds of a property insurance claim; and
 (B)  the person selling the good or service will[,
 without the insurer's consent]:
 (i)  pay, waive, absorb, or otherwise
 decline to charge or collect the amount of the insured's
 deductible;
 (ii)  provide a rebate or credit in
 connection with the sale of the good or service that will offset all
 or part of the amount paid by the insured as a deductible; or
 (iii)  in any other manner assist the
 insured in avoiding monetary payment of the required insurance
 deductible; or
 (2)  provides a good or service to an insured under a
 property insurance policy knowing that the insured will pay for the
 good or service with the proceeds of a claim under the policy and[,
 without the insurer's consent]:
 (A)  pays, waives, absorbs, or otherwise declines
 to charge or collect the amount of the insured's deductible;
 (B)  provides a rebate or credit in connection
 with the sale of the good or service that offsets all or part of the
 amount paid by the insured as a deductible; or
 (C)  in any other manner assists the insured in
 avoiding monetary payment of the required insurance deductible.
 SECTION 2.  Section 707.004, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 707.004.  [REASONABLE PROOF OF] PAYMENT OF DEDUCTIBLE.
 (a) An insurer that issues a property insurance policy with
 replacement cost coverage shall [may] refuse to pay a claim for
 withheld recoverable depreciation or a replacement cost holdback
 under the policy until the insurer receives reasonable proof of
 payment by the policyholder of any deductible applicable to the
 claim. Reasonable proof of payment includes a canceled check,
 money order receipt, credit card statement, or copy of an executed
 installment plan contract or other financing arrangement that
 requires full payment of the deductible over time.  This subsection
 does not prohibit an insurer from waiving any deductible amount.
 (b)  An insurer waiving a deductible owed by a policyholder
 under a property insurance policy for any reason may not require as
 a condition the policyholder's use of the insurer's preferred or
 recommended contractor for the claim subject to the deductible.
 SECTION 3.  Section 707.004, Insurance Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to an insurance policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 policy delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *