Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1289 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/04/2023

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 1289
 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2023; March 9, 2023,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture &
 Rural Affairs; April 4, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 April 4, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1289 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disposal of reclaimed wastewater.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 26, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 26.02715 to read as follows:
 Sec. 26.02715.  DISPOSAL OF RECLAIMED WASTEWATER TO
 WASTEWATER COLLECTION SYSTEM. (a) A wastewater treatment facility
 or reclaimed water production facility that treats domestic
 wastewater for reuse may dispose of the treated wastewater without
 a permit for an alternative means of disposal if the facility:
 (1)  disposes of the treated wastewater through a
 wastewater collection system; and
 (2)  has the consent of the operator of:
 (A)  the wastewater collection system that will
 receive the treated wastewater; and
 (B)  any wastewater treatment facility that will
 further treat the treated wastewater.
 (b)  The owner of a reclaimed water production facility that
 meets the requirements of Subsection (a) may not be required to be
 the owner of an associated domestic wastewater treatment facility
 that is permitted by the commission.
 (c)  The commission shall adopt rules to implement and
 enforce this section.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall
 adopt the rules required by Section 26.02715, Water Code, as added
 by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *