By: Perry, Birdwell S.B. No. 1290 (In the Senate - Filed February 28, 2023; March 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs; April 17, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 17, 2023, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1290 By: Perry A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to a study of the effects of the installation, operation, removal, and disposal of solar, wind turbine, and energy storage equipment. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. DEFINITION. In this Act, "commission" means the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. SECTION 2. STUDY ON EFFECTS OF INSTALLATION, OPERATION, REMOVAL, AND DISPOSAL OF CERTAIN EQUIPMENT. (a) The commission shall conduct a study on the current and potential effects of the installation, operation, removal, and disposal of solar, wind turbine, and energy storage equipment on the environment and watersheds. (b) In conducting the study under this section, the commission shall consult with: (1) the Department of Agriculture; (2) the Texas A&M Forest Service; (3) the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service; (4) the Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service; (5) groundwater conservation districts; and (6) river authorities. (c) The commission may enter into a memorandum of understanding with a university or foundation to assist with the study. (d) Not later than December 1, 2024, the commission shall submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives a report that includes the findings of the study conducted under this section. SECTION 3. EXPIRATION. This Act expires January 1, 2025. SECTION 4. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2023. * * * * *