Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1290 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/25/2023

                    S.B. No. 1290


 AN ACT
 relating to a study of the effects of the installation, operation,
 removal, and disposal of solar, wind turbine, and energy storage
 equipment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITION.  In this Act, "commission" means
 the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
 SECTION 2.  STUDY ON EFFECTS OF INSTALLATION, OPERATION,
 REMOVAL, AND DISPOSAL OF CERTAIN EQUIPMENT. (a) The commission
 shall conduct a study on the current and potential effects of the
 installation, operation, removal, and disposal of solar, wind
 turbine, and energy storage equipment on the environment and
 watersheds.
 (b)  In conducting the study under this section, the
 commission shall consult with:
 (1)  the Department of Agriculture;
 (2)  the Texas A&M Forest Service;
 (3)  the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service;
 (4)  the Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service;
 (5)  groundwater conservation districts; and
 (6)  river authorities.
 (c)  The commission may enter into a memorandum of
 understanding with a university or foundation to assist with the
 study.
 (d)  Not later than December 1, 2024, the commission shall
 submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives a report that includes the findings of the
 study conducted under this section.
 SECTION 3.  EXPIRATION.  This Act expires January 1, 2025.
 SECTION 4.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1290 passed the Senate on
 April 20, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1290 passed the House on
 May 24, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 132, Nays 6,
 one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor