Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1290 Senate Committee Report / Analysis

Filed 04/13/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   C.S.S.B. 1290     88R15238 MP-D   By: Perry         Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs         4/13/2023         Committee Report (Substituted)          AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Currently, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (TCEQ) does not track contamination from the installation, operation, decommission, or disposal of solar panels, energy storage, or wind turbines. Many of these facilities or their components are coming to the end of their life span. Other states are seeing an increase in disposal of the components.   The bill requires TCEQ to study the effects of the installation, operation, decommission, and disposal of solar panels, energy storage, and wind turbines on the environment and watershed.    (Original Author's/Sponsor's Statement of Intent)   C.S.S.B. 1290 amends current law relating to a study of the effects of the installation, operation, removal, and disposal of solar, wind turbine, and energy storage equipment.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. DEFINITION. Defines "commission."   SECTION 2. STUDY ON EFFECTS OF INSTALLATION, OPERATION, REMOVAL, AND DISPOSAL OF CERTAIN EQUIPMENT. (a) Requires the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (TCEQ) to conduct a study on the current and potential effects of the installation, operation, removal, and disposal of solar, wind turbine, and energy storage equipment on the environment and watersheds.   (b) Requires TCEQ, in conducting the study under this section, to consult with:   (1) the Texas Department of Agriculture;   (2) the Texas A&M Forest Service;   (3) the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service;   (4) the Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service;   (5) groundwater conservation districts; and    (6) river authorities.   (c) Authorizes TCEQ to enter into a memorandum of understanding with a university or foundation to assist with the study.   (d) Requires TCEQ, not later than December 1, 2024, to submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives a report that includes the findings of the study conducted under this section.   SECTION 3. EXPIRATION. Provides that this Act expires January 1, 2025.   SECTION 4. EFFECTIVE DATE. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2023.   

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 1290
88R15238 MP-D By: Perry
 Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs
 4/13/2023
 Committee Report (Substituted)

Senate Research Center

C.S.S.B. 1290

88R15238 MP-D

By: Perry

 

Water, Agriculture & Rural Affairs

 

4/13/2023

 

Committee Report (Substituted)

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Currently, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (TCEQ) does not track contamination from the installation, operation, decommission, or disposal of solar panels, energy storage, or wind turbines. Many of these facilities or their components are coming to the end of their life span. Other states are seeing an increase in disposal of the components.

 

The bill requires TCEQ to study the effects of the installation, operation, decommission, and disposal of solar panels, energy storage, and wind turbines on the environment and watershed. 

 

(Original Author's/Sponsor's Statement of Intent)

 

C.S.S.B. 1290 amends current law relating to a study of the effects of the installation, operation, removal, and disposal of solar, wind turbine, and energy storage equipment.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. DEFINITION. Defines "commission."

 

SECTION 2. STUDY ON EFFECTS OF INSTALLATION, OPERATION, REMOVAL, AND DISPOSAL OF CERTAIN EQUIPMENT. (a) Requires the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (TCEQ) to conduct a study on the current and potential effects of the installation, operation, removal, and disposal of solar, wind turbine, and energy storage equipment on the environment and watersheds.

 

(b) Requires TCEQ, in conducting the study under this section, to consult with:

 

(1) the Texas Department of Agriculture;

 

(2) the Texas A&M Forest Service;

 

(3) the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service;

 

(4) the Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service;

 

(5) groundwater conservation districts; and 

 

(6) river authorities.

 

(c) Authorizes TCEQ to enter into a memorandum of understanding with a university or foundation to assist with the study.

 

(d) Requires TCEQ, not later than December 1, 2024, to submit to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives a report that includes the findings of the study conducted under this section.

 

SECTION 3. EXPIRATION. Provides that this Act expires January 1, 2025.

 

SECTION 4. EFFECTIVE DATE. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2023.