Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1340 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1340
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 17, 2023, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1340 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the local development agreement database maintained by
 the comptroller of public accounts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 403.0246(a)(2) and (3), Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Local development agreement" means:
 (A)  an agreement entered into by a municipality
 under Section 380.001 or 380.002, Local Government Code;
 (B)  an agreement entered into by a county under
 Section 381.004, Local Government Code; [or]
 (C)  an agreement entered into by a local
 government under Chapter 312, Tax Code; or
 (D)  any other agreement to grant or otherwise
 commit public money or other resources for economic development
 purposes by a local government under Chapter 380 or 381, Local
 Government Code.
 (3)  "Local government" includes:
 (A)  a municipality;
 (B)  a county;
 (C)  a school district;
 (D)  a county industrial commission under Section
 381.001, Local Government Code; or
 (E) [(D)]  a board of development under Section
 381.002, Local Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 403.0246, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b) and (c) and adding Subsection (h) to read
 as follows:
 (b)  The comptroller shall create and make accessible on the
 Internet a database, to be known as the Local Development [Chapter
 380 and 381] Agreement Database, that contains information
 regarding all local development agreements in this state.
 (c)  For each local development agreement described by
 Subsection (b), the database must include:
 (1)  the name of the local government that entered into
 the agreement;
 (2)  a numerical code assigned to the local government
 by the comptroller;
 (3)  the address of the local government's
 administrative offices and public contact information;
 (4)  the name of the appropriate officer or other
 person representing the local government and that person's contact
 information;
 (5)  the name and contact information of any entity or
 the entity's agent that entered into the agreement with the local
 government, including the business address and any assumed names of
 the entity;
 (6)  the date on which the agreement went into effect
 and the date and terms on which the agreement expires;
 (7)  the focus or scope of the agreement;
 (8)  an electronic copy of the agreement; [and]
 (9)  the name and contact information of the individual
 reporting the information to the comptroller;
 (10)  the total monetary value of the agreement; and
 (11)  the source of the money used or type of tax
 implicated by the agreement, including a sales and use tax, ad
 valorem tax, or hotel occupancy tax.
 (h)  The comptroller may prescribe the form and manner in
 which a local government must submit information under Subsection
 (c).
 SECTION 3.  Section 312.005(a), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (a)  The comptroller shall maintain a central registry of
 reinvestment zones designated under this chapter and of ad valorem
 tax abatement agreements executed under this chapter. The chief
 appraiser of each appraisal district that appraises property for a
 taxing unit that has designated a reinvestment zone or executed a
 tax abatement agreement under this chapter shall deliver to the
 comptroller before July 1 of the year following the year in which
 the zone is designated or the agreement is executed a report
 providing the following information:
 (1)  for a reinvestment zone, a general description of
 the zone, including its size, the types of property located in it,
 its duration, and the guidelines and criteria established for the
 reinvestment zone under Section 312.002, including subsequent
 amendments and modifications of the guidelines or criteria;
 (2)  a copy of each tax abatement agreement to which a
 taxing unit that participates in the appraisal district is a party;
 (3)  the information described by Section
 312.205(a)(1) of this code and Section 403.0246(c), Government
 Code, in connection with each tax abatement agreement described by
 Subdivision (2) of this subsection; and
 (4)  any other information required by the comptroller
 to administer this section.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter A, Chapter 312, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 312.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 312.008.  INTERNET LINK TO AGREEMENT. A taxing unit
 that maintains an Internet website and that executes a tax
 abatement agreement under this chapter shall provide on the website
 a direct link to the location of the agreement information
 published on the comptroller's Internet website under Section
 403.0246, Government Code.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an agreement entered into on or after the effective date of this
 Act. An agreement entered into before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the agreement is
 entered into, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *