Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1341 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 04/24/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West, Menéndez S.B. No. 1341
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 April 24, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 24, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the application review process for certain delayed
 birth certificates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 192.025, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The state registrar may not reject an application under
 this subchapter based solely on the inclusion of supporting
 evidence that contains inconsistent or contradictory information
 if, based on the contents of the application as a whole, the state
 registrar determines by a preponderance of the evidence the
 applicant's identity and place of birth. In making a determination
 under this subsection, the state registrar shall consider and give
 weight to:
 (1)  any supporting evidence that raises a legitimate
 question as to the applicant's actual place of birth;
 (2)  the inclusion of a valid driver's license or
 personal identification certificate; and
 (3)  the inclusion of a verified affidavit by a person
 with personal knowledge of the applicant's identity.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *