Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1370 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/02/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Paxton S.B. No. 1370
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2023; March 16, 2023, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 May 2, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2, one present not
 voting; May 2, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1370 By:  King


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information contained in the annual financial audit of
 certain regional transportation authorities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter J, Chapter 452, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 452.453 to read as follows:
 Sec. 452.453.  DISAGGREGATION OF EXPENDITURES: CERTAIN
 AUTHORITIES. The subregional board of an authority consisting of
 one subregion governed by a subregional board created under
 Subchapter O shall disaggregate expenditures by member
 municipality in an annual financial report using a uniform
 methodology that is proposed by the authority, provided to the
 board, and approved by resolution of a simple majority of the member
 municipalities' governing bodies. On request of a simple majority
 of the member municipalities' governing bodies, the authority shall
 propose a new methodology for disaggregating expenditures by member
 municipality under this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *